THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:49:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 520 Locust Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1V2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 634-5573
Fax: 289-816-0195

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 25 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O. Weiglein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Weiglein (CPSO#: 33397 )
Business Address: 520 Locust St
Burlington ON L7S 1V2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 520 Locust Street
Burlington Ontario L7S 1V2
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (905) 634-5573
Fax: 289-816-0195

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 25 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: O. Weiglein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Weiglein (CPSO#: 33397 )
Business Address: 520 Locust St
Burlington ON L7S 1V2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OTTO WEIGLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIGLEIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OTTO WEIGLEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEIGLEIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 25 May 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2013

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 25 May 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 May 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1975