THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:27:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9056
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Judges Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Judges (CPSO#: 33454 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 9056
Grand River Hospital
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Judges Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Judges (CPSO#: 33454 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PAUL JUDGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUDGES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID PAUL JUDGES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUDGES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1980