THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:44:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto East Health Network
Chest Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-7777
Fax: (416) 469-7717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 01 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian M. Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Fraser (CPSO#: 33484 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Respiratory Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-7777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto East Health Network
Chest Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-7777
Fax: (416) 469-7717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Respirology
Effective: 01 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian M. Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Fraser (CPSO#: 33484 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Respiratory Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-7777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN MURRAY FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IAN MURRAY FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1982

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1980

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1976