THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:39:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 416-398-0638 or 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 09 Dec 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Maskens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Maskens (CPSO#: 33508 )
Business Address: 483 Homewood Avenue
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2N2
7057727027
Business Address: 205 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
(705) 741-5510

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 14 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services
111 St. Regis Crescent S
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
Phone: 416-398-0638 or 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 09 Dec 2024

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P. Maskens Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Maskens (CPSO#: 33508 )
Business Address: 483 Homewood Avenue
Peterborough Ontario K9H 2N2
7057727027
Business Address: 205 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
(705) 741-5510

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER DUNCAN MASKENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASKENS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER DUNCAN MASKENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASKENS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981