THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:39:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13 Bellehaven Crescent
Toronto Ontario M1M 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165542342
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Reznick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Reznick (CPSO#: 33510 )
Business Address: 18 Barrie Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-6000
Business Address: 13 Bellehaven Cres
Business Address: 13 Bellehaven Cres

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 13 Bellehaven Crescent
Toronto Ontario M1M 1H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165542342
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Reznick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Reznick (CPSO#: 33510 )
Business Address: 18 Barrie Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-6000
Business Address: 13 Bellehaven Cres
Business Address: 13 Bellehaven Cres

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD KEITH REZNICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REZNICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD KEITH REZNICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REZNICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1977