THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:12:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TIV

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 359 Talbot Street
ST Thomas
St Thomas ON N5P 1B7
Business Email: 5196337989
Phone: (519)633-7989
Fax: (519) 633-8467
Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
St Thomas Ontario N5R 1R4
Phone: 519-631-2020
Extension: 2196
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ndur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ndur (CPSO#: 33511 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TIV
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 359 Talbot Street
ST Thomas
St Thomas ON N5P 1B7
Business Email: 5196337989
Phone: (519)633-7989
Fax: (519) 633-8467
Address: 189 Elm Street
St Thomas
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
St Thomas Ontario N5R 1R4
Phone: 519-631-2020
Extension: 2196
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital
LOCATION: St Thomas

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ndur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ndur (CPSO#: 33511 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA DOOYUM NDUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NDUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA DOOYUM NDUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NDUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1977