THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 06:40:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Rome, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6A-8633 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 9R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-266-1861
Fax: 905-266-1172

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Papini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Papini (CPSO#: 33532 )
Business Address: 8633 Weston Rd
8633 Weston Rd suite 6a
Woodbridge ON L4L 9R6
905 2661861
Business Address: 408-8333 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 8E2
905-266-1861

Corporation Name: Dr. Osvaldo Papini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Oct 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Rome, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6A-8633 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 9R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-266-1861
Fax: 905-266-1172

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. O. Papini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Papini (CPSO#: 33532 )
Business Address: 8633 Weston Rd
8633 Weston Rd suite 6a
Woodbridge ON L4L 9R6
905 2661861
Business Address: 408-8333 Weston Rd
Woodbridge ON L4L 8E2
905-266-1861

Corporation Name: Dr. Osvaldo Papini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Oct 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OSVALDO PAPINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPINI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OSVALDO PAPINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAPINI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Rome, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1982
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jul 1982