THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:53:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: (613) 907-8003
Address: Division of Neurology
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Duncan McIlraith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McIlraith (CPSO#: 33618 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 722-7000
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 722-7000
Business Address: The Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 722-7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Fax: (613) 907-8003
Address: Division of Neurology
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Duncan McIlraith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McIlraith (CPSO#: 33618 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
(613) 722-7000
Business Address: 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 722-7000
Business Address: The Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7W9
(613) 722-7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUNCAN MCLEOD MCILRAITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCILRAITH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DUNCAN MCLEOD MCILRAITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCILRAITH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1983

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981