THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:46:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Karl Fraser Rd
North York ON M3C 0E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-499-8242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weksberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Weksberg (CPSO#: 33808 )
Business Address: 22 Karl Fraser Rd
North York ON M3C 0E8
Business Address: 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 324
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 499-8242

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 22 Karl Fraser Rd
North York ON M3C 0E8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-499-8242
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Weksberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Weksberg (CPSO#: 33808 )
Business Address: 22 Karl Fraser Rd
North York ON M3C 0E8
Business Address: 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 324
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 499-8242

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFRED WEKSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEKSBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFRED WEKSBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEKSBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981