THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:53:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Young St
Suite 419
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053873561
Fax: 9053870398

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 08 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George R. Stallwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Stallwood (CPSO#: 33851 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 387-3561
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: Unit 401
1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 387-3561
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3Z5
(905) 527-4322

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Young St
Suite 419
Hamilton ON L8N 1T8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053873561
Fax: 9053870398

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 08 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 08 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George R. Stallwood Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Mar 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Stallwood (CPSO#: 33851 )
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 387-3561
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-4322
Business Address: Unit 401
1 Young Street
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1T8
(905) 387-3561
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3Z5
(905) 527-4322

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE RANDLE STALLWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STALLWOOD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEORGE RANDLE STALLWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STALLWOOD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1982
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Dec 1982