THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:30:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 1965
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital And Cancer Ctr
Room A3-65
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76384
Fax: (905) 575-7320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irwin Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Walker (CPSO#: 41934 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Ctr
711 Concession Street
Suite A3-65
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital And Cancer Ctr
Room A3-65
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 76384
Fax: (905) 575-7320

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 20 Nov 1973
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Nov 1972
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1973
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1972
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Irwin Walker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Walker (CPSO#: 41934 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Ctr
711 Concession Street
Suite A3-65
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRWIN RONALD WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRWIN RONALD WALKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALKER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medicine, Dentistry & Health Sciences, 1965

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1973
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 1994

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 1984
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 1984

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1973

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1973

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1971