THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:25:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1963
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 398-8387
Fax: (416) 398-0285

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Mar 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krystyna Mandelman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mandelman (CPSO#: 42253 )
Business Address: 205 - 4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 3S3
(416) 398-8387

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, POLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 205
4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 398-8387
Fax: (416) 398-0285

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 13 Mar 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krystyna Mandelman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Mandelman (CPSO#: 42253 )
Business Address: 205 - 4430 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 3S3
(416) 398-8387

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA MANDELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDELMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRYSTYNA MANDELMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANDELMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Warsaw Faculty of Medicine, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Public Service, Federal Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 1989

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1979

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Public Service, Federal Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1972