THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:57:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1974
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 675-4530
Fax: 416 213-4206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 22 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eva M. Szentgyorgyi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Szentgyorgyi (CPSO#: 42381 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800
Business Address: Life Labs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
(416) 675-4530

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LifeLabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 675-4530
Fax: 416 213-4206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 22 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eva M. Szentgyorgyi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Szentgyorgyi (CPSO#: 42381 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800
Business Address: Life Labs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
(416) 675-4530

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVA MARIA SZENTGYORGYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZENTGYORGYI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVA MARIA SZENTGYORGYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZENTGYORGYI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of Semmelweis, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 1990

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1975