THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:04:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Grand Avenue West
Suite 214
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193973791
Fax: 5193970736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ranjith Chandrasena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chandrasena (CPSO#: 42434 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE
Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 240 Grand Avenue West
Suite 214
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193973791
Fax: 5193970736

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Woodstock Hospital Woodstock
Four Counties Health Services Newbury
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Chatham Public General Hospital Society
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Woodstock Hospital
LOCATION: Woodstock

HOSPITAL: Four Counties Health Services
LOCATION: Newbury

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ranjith Chandrasena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chandrasena (CPSO#: 42434 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANJITH DAYANANDA CHANDRASENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRASENA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANJITH DAYANANDA CHANDRASENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRASENA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ceylon, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1985

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1981