THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:41:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite H-2247
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-696-7297
Fax: 613-696-7134

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Le May Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Le May (CPSO#: 42669 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Suite H2247
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7297

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite H-2247
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-696-7297
Fax: 613-696-7134

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michel Le May Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Sep 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Le May (CPSO#: 42669 )
Business Address: University of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Suite H2247
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4W7
(613) 696-7297

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH MICHEL ROBERT LE MAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE MAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH MICHEL ROBERT LE MAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LE MAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978