THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:33:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
1500 Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-7346
Fax: (705) 523-6806
Address: West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol St
Sturgeon Falls, ON
P2B 2Y6
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
Phone: (705) 753-3110
Fax: (705) 753-3131
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury, ON
P3E 5J1
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Labonte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 2
1500 Paris Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 3B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 522-7346
Fax: (705) 523-6806
Address: West Nipissing General Hospital
725 Coursol St
Sturgeon Falls, ON
P2B 2Y6
Sturgeon Falls Ontario P2B 2Y6
Phone: (705) 753-3110
Fax: (705) 753-3131
Address: Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury, ON
P3E 5J1
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 29 Nov 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: West Nipissing General Hospital
LOCATION: Sturgeon Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Labonte Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Aug 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROGER EDMOND LABONTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABONTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROGER EDMOND LABONTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LABONTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981