THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Ewen Road
Hamilton Ontario L8S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-3014
Fax: (905) 527-9149

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Missiuna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Missiuna (CPSO#: 43159 )
Business Address: 10 Ewen Road
Hamilton Ontario L8S 3C4
(905) 527-3014

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 10 Ewen Road
Hamilton Ontario L8S 3C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 527-3014
Fax: (905) 527-9149

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Missiuna Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Missiuna (CPSO#: 43159 )
Business Address: 10 Ewen Road
Hamilton Ontario L8S 3C4
(905) 527-3014

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL CESAR MISSIUNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISSIUNA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL CESAR MISSIUNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MISSIUNA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981