THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:39:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-5247
Fax: (905) 721-3560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 10 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Walji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Walji (CPSO#: 43198 )
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-4937
Business Address: 98 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0E4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 721-5247
Fax: (905) 721-3560

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 10 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Walji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Walji (CPSO#: 43198 )
Business Address: 117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 721-4937
Business Address: 98 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0E4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOEZ BADRUDIN WALJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOEZ BADRUDIN WALJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WALJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981