THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 04:34:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lifelabs
100 International Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9W6J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166754530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 09 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William F. Brien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Brien (CPSO#: 43219 )
Business Address: Lifelabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
(416) 675-4530

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lifelabs
100 International Blvd
Toronto Ontario M9W6J6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166754530
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematological Pathology
Effective: 09 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematological Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William F. Brien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Brien (CPSO#: 43219 )
Business Address: Lifelabs
100 International Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9W 6J6
(416) 675-4530

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANCIS BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM FRANCIS BRIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRIEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1977