THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:48:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 ghyslain
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: 613-636-6175

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Dvorkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dvorkin (CPSO#: 43781 )
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
(613) 632-1111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1111 ghyslain
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-632-1111
Fax: 613-636-6175

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 26 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 26 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gary Dvorkin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dvorkin (CPSO#: 43781 )
Business Address: 1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury Ontario K6A 3G5
(613) 632-1111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY STEVEN DVORKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DVORKIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY STEVEN DVORKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DVORKIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 1992

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979