THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:49:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138849658
Fax: 6137484914
Address: Unit 11
900 Watters Road
Cumberland Ontario K4A 3R1
Phone: (613) 830-3837
Fax: No Information Available
Address: quipe de sant‚ familiale
communautaire de l'Est d'Ottawa
1811 boul. St-Joseph,
Orleans, Ontario
Ottawa Ontario K1E 3W6
Phone: (613) 590-0533
Fax: (613) 590-7351

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Chile

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre C. Tessier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tessier (CPSO#: 43942 )
Business Address: 1811 St Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 7C6
(613) 590-0533
Business Address: 11 - 900 Watters Road
Ottawa Ontario K4A 3R1
(613) 830-3837
Business Address: Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Ottawa, Ontario
Vanier ON K1L 0A8
6138849658

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138849658
Fax: 6137484914
Address: Unit 11
900 Watters Road
Cumberland Ontario K4A 3R1
Phone: (613) 830-3837
Fax: No Information Available
Address: quipe de sant‚ familiale
communautaire de l'Est d'Ottawa
1811 boul. St-Joseph,
Orleans, Ontario
Ottawa Ontario K1E 3W6
Phone: (613) 590-0533
Fax: (613) 590-7351

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1980
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec
Chile

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre C. Tessier Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tessier (CPSO#: 43942 )
Business Address: 1811 St Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 7C6
(613) 590-0533
Business Address: 11 - 900 Watters Road
Ottawa Ontario K4A 3R1
(613) 830-3837
Business Address: Hopital Montfort
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: Ottawa, Ontario
Vanier ON K1L 0A8
6138849658

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE CHARLES TESSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE CHARLES TESSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESSIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979