THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:02:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rick Ogilvie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ogilvie (CPSO#: 50024 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Main St W
McMaster Childrens Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rick Ogilvie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ogilvie (CPSO#: 50024 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICK ARTHUR OGILVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGILVIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICK ARTHUR OGILVIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OGILVIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1978