THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:36:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 501
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-1317
Fax: (905) 521-1297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adachi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Adachi (CPSO#: 50049 )
Business Address: 501 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
(905) 529-1317

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 501
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 529-1317
Fax: (905) 521-1297

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adachi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Adachi (CPSO#: 50049 )
Business Address: 501 - 25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1Y2
(905) 529-1317

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN DERRICK JUN ADACHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADACHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN DERRICK JUN ADACHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADACHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Feb 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979