THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:22:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 35 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 425-6095
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martha Adams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Adams (CPSO#: 50050 )
Business Address: 35 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1N7
(416) 425-6095

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 35 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 425-6095
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martha Adams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Adams (CPSO#: 50050 )
Business Address: 35 Rumsey Road
Toronto Ontario M4G 1N7
(416) 425-6095

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTHA ELAINE ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTHA ELAINE ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982