THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:05:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 722-5333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 202-2100 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3N 2Z9
Phone: 416 743 6372
Fax: 416 741 2276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 26 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Amba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amba (CPSO#: 50075 )
Business Address: 202 - 121 Wellington Street West
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
(705) 722-5333
Business Address: 2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2Z9
4167436372

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Delhi, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
121 Wellington Street West
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 722-5333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 202-2100 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3N 2Z9
Phone: 416 743 6372
Fax: 416 741 2276

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 26 May 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Amba Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amba (CPSO#: 50075 )
Business Address: 202 - 121 Wellington Street West
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
(705) 722-5333
Business Address: 2100 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3N 2Z9
4167436372

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDHIR AMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUDHIR AMBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Delhi, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1987

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1982