THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:02:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 672 Brant Street
Suite 206
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 333-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Armstrong (CPSO#: 50090 )
Business Address: 206 - 672 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
(905) 333-3311
Business Address: 3027 Harvester Road
Suite 506
Burlington Ontario L7N 3G7
905-333-5100 Extn: 7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 672 Brant Street
Suite 206
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 333-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Armstrong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Armstrong (CPSO#: 50090 )
Business Address: 206 - 672 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
(905) 333-3311
Business Address: 3027 Harvester Road
Suite 506
Burlington Ontario L7N 3G7
905-333-5100 Extn: 7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT DOUGLAS ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT DOUGLAS ARMSTRONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARMSTRONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981