THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:33:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 127 Westmore Drive
Unit # 103
Etobicoke Ontario M9V3Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 749 3933
Fax: 416 749 3936

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahid Aziz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aziz (CPSO#: 50103 )
Business Address: 103 - 127 Westmore Drive
Toronto Ontario M9V 3Y6
(416) 749-3933

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 127 Westmore Drive
Unit # 103
Etobicoke Ontario M9V3Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 749 3933
Fax: 416 749 3936

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 17 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahid Aziz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Aziz (CPSO#: 50103 )
Business Address: 103 - 127 Westmore Drive
Toronto Ontario M9V 3Y6
(416) 749-3933

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMED SHAHID AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUHAMMED SHAHID AZIZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AZIZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1986
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Institutional - Hospital Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1986

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1982