THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:27:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1965
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1166 Bay Street Suite 605
Toronto ON M5S 2X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-923-1640
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1121 Bay St
Toronto ON M5S 3L9
Phone: 4169231640
Fax: 4169231174

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.Bagheri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bagheri (CPSO#: 50106 )
Business Address: Bay
Toronto Ontario M5S2X8
4169221818
Business Address: 1121 Bay St
Toronto ON M5S 3L9
416 9231640
Business Address: 1206 - 180 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5S 2V6
(416) 923-1640

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1166 Bay Street Suite 605
Toronto ON M5S 2X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-923-1640
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1121 Bay St
Toronto ON M5S 3L9
Phone: 4169231640
Fax: 4169231174

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.Bagheri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bagheri (CPSO#: 50106 )
Business Address: Bay
Toronto Ontario M5S2X8
4169221818
Business Address: 1121 Bay St
Toronto ON M5S 3L9
416 9231640
Business Address: 1206 - 180 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M5S 2V6
(416) 923-1640

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AGHDAS BAGHERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGHERI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AGHDAS BAGHERI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGHERI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 1965

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981