THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:25:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 371-0563
Fax: (519) 371-9304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory P. Becks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Becks (CPSO#: 50129 )
Business Address: 90 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
(519) 364-2340
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Suite 7202
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 371-0563

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 371-0563
Fax: (519) 371-9304

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 21 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Hanover and District Hospital
LOCATION: Hanover

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gregory P. Becks Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Sep 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Becks (CPSO#: 50129 )
Business Address: 90 7th Avenue
Hanover Ontario N4N 1N1
(519) 364-2340
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Brightshores Health System
Suite 7202
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 6M9
(519) 371-0563

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY PHILIP BECKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY PHILIP BECKS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BECKS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1979