THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:50:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (855) 756-3454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bloom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bloom (CPSO#: 50169 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Anesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Fax: (855) 756-3454

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 14 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bloom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bloom (CPSO#: 50169 )
Business Address: 4001 Leslie Street
North York Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6000
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 530-6000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRA MURRAY BLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRA MURRAY BLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981