THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:17:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 221
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 462-9449
Fax: (416) 462-9826
Address: Sensenbrenner hospital
10 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N3H5
Phone: 7053376111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Timmins and district hospital
700 Ross Ave
Timmins Ontario P4N8P2
Phone: 7052672101
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Albany Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University Health Network
The Toronto Hospital
Western Division
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 06 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald S. Borrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Borrett (CPSO#: 50181 )
Business Address: 221 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
(416) 462-9449

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 221
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 462-9449
Fax: (416) 462-9826
Address: Sensenbrenner hospital
10 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing Ontario P5N3H5
Phone: 7053376111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Timmins and district hospital
700 Ross Ave
Timmins Ontario P4N8P2
Phone: 7052672101
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Albany Clinic
807 Broadview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4K 2P8
Phone: (416) 461-9471
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University Health Network
The Toronto Hospital
Western Division
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 06 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald S. Borrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Borrett (CPSO#: 50181 )
Business Address: 221 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
(416) 462-9449

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD STEPHEN BORRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORRETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONALD STEPHEN BORRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORRETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978