THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:53:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria South Site
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 6B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 724-5592
Fax: (519) 207-0195

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry M. Brownscombe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Brownscombe (CPSO#: 50214 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria South Site
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 6B5
(519) 685-8166
Business Address: 1199 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 2Z2
Business Address: 21 McGivern Street
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria South Site
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 6B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 724-5592
Fax: (519) 207-0195

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larry M. Brownscombe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Brownscombe (CPSO#: 50214 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria South Site
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6C 6B5
(519) 685-8166
Business Address: 1199 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 2Z2
Business Address: 21 McGivern Street
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARRY MASON BROWNSCOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWNSCOMBE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LARRY MASON BROWNSCOMBE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROWNSCOMBE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1979