THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:23:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Peter Bryson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bryson (CPSO#: 50220 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 540-1061

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 21 Nov 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.C. Peter Bryson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bryson (CPSO#: 50220 )
Business Address: Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Ontario K7L 2V7
(613) 540-1061

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL CHARLES PETER BRYSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL CHARLES PETER BRYSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRYSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978