THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:01:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 262 Aberdeen Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8P 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053080110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Norman Buckley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Buckley (CPSO#: 50222 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 262 Aberdeen Avenue
Hamilton Ontario L8P 2R3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053080110
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1988
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1988
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Norman Buckley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Buckley (CPSO#: 50222 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID NORMAN BUCKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID NORMAN BUCKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCKLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982