THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:54:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-579-1477
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 24 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert J. Anstett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Anstett (CPSO#: 50238 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 590-1720

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-579-1477
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 24 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert J. Anstett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Anstett (CPSO#: 50238 )
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 590-1720

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN ANSTETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSTETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN ANSTETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANSTETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981