THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:34:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
194 Main Street
Ottawa Ontario K1S 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 230-6388
Fax: (613) 234-2108

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Comerton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Comerton (CPSO#: 50283 )
Business Address: Suite 210
194 Main Street
Ottawa Ontario K1S 1C2
(613) 230-6388

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 210
194 Main Street
Ottawa Ontario K1S 1C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 230-6388
Fax: (613) 234-2108

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Comerton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Comerton (CPSO#: 50283 )
Business Address: Suite 210
194 Main Street
Ottawa Ontario K1S 1C2
(613) 230-6388

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH COMERTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMERTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY ELIZABETH COMERTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMERTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981