THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:41:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 576 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 528-5292
Fax: (905) 528-7753

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenda Copps Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Copps (CPSO#: 50289 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-4941
Business Address: 576 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1J2
(905) 528-5292
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-4322

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 576 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 528-5292
Fax: (905) 528-7753

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brenda Copps Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Copps (CPSO#: 50289 )
Business Address: 1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100
Business Address: 50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-4941
Business Address: 576 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1J2
(905) 528-5292
Business Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Address: 711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 527-4322

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDA ELIZABETH COPPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COPPS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDA ELIZABETH COPPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COPPS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981