THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:38:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Center
3115
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9077238551
Extension: 5414
Fax: 9057213585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 20 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David T. Crisp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Crisp (CPSO#: 50303 )
Business Address: The Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
905 723-8551 Extn: 5414
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
905 723-8551 Extn: 5414

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Health Center
3115
Whitby Ontario L1P 1Y5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9077238551
Extension: 5414
Fax: 9057213585

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 20 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 07 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David T. Crisp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Crisp (CPSO#: 50303 )
Business Address: The Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa Ontario L1H 1B9
(905) 723-8551
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
905 723-8551 Extn: 5414
Business Address: 198 Des Newman Boulevard
Whitby Ontario L1P 0P9
905 723-8551 Extn: 5414

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID THOMAS CRISP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRISP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID THOMAS CRISP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRISP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978