THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:56:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Room 1566A
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 668-1013
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 13 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre Cardinal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cardinal (CPSO#: 50344 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
W0528 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8168

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Room 1566A
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 668-1013
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 13 Nov 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pierre Cardinal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Cardinal (CPSO#: 50344 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
W0528 - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8168

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE CARDINAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARDINAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE CARDINAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CARDINAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1987
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1987

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1982