THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:16:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Westmount Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 5H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-824-6000
Extension: 4080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Aug 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer M. Caspers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Caspers (CPSO#: 50352 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre Guelph
Administration
3rd Floor
529-824-6000 Extn: 4080
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350 Extn: 2212
Business Address: Guelph Medical Place
202 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 767-1512

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Westmount Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 5H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-824-6000
Extension: 4080
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Aug 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 23 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph Guelph
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre, Guelph
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer M. Caspers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Caspers (CPSO#: 50352 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre Guelph
Administration
3rd Floor
529-824-6000 Extn: 4080
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
(519) 822-5350 Extn: 2212
Business Address: Guelph Medical Place
202 - 83 Dawson Road
Guelph Ontario N1H 1B1
(519) 767-1512

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MARY DE MEYSEY CASPERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASPERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER MARY DE MEYSEY CASPERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASPERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981