THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:35:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 603-5732
Fax: 416 603-3437

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Roderick Davey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Davey (CPSO#: 50361 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street -Toronto Western Hospital
13MC-433 (13th floor McLaughlin Wing)
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5732

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 603-5732
Fax: 416 603-3437

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Roderick Davey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Davey (CPSO#: 50361 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street -Toronto Western Hospital
13MC-433 (13th floor McLaughlin Wing)
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5732

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN RODERICK DAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN RODERICK DAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980