THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:41:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-1262 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3B 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-429-4110
Fax: 416-429-1564

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jul 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should contact RECORDS ACCESS SERVICES CANADA, INC. (RASCI) at 1- (800)-971-8038
Date Received: 10 Apr 2021

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Betty Choi-Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Choi-Fung (CPSO#: 50403 )
Business Address: 209-1262 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3B 2W7
416-429-4110
Business Address: 208 - 1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2W7
(416) 429-4110

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 209-1262 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3B 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-429-4110
Fax: 416-429-1564

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jul 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 13 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients should contact RECORDS ACCESS SERVICES CANADA, INC. (RASCI) at 1- (800)-971-8038
Date Received: 10 Apr 2021

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Betty Choi-Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Choi-Fung (CPSO#: 50403 )
Business Address: 209-1262 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3B 2W7
416-429-4110
Business Address: 208 - 1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto Ontario M3B 2W7
(416) 429-4110

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BETTY LAI SEE CHOI-FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI-FUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BETTY LAI SEE CHOI-FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI-FUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982