THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:11:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 405
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 264-5977
Fax: (905) 264-9686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 28 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DARIO DEL RIZZO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Del Rizzo (CPSO#: 50420 )
Business Address: 405-8333 Weston Road
Vaughan Ontario L4L 8E2
905-264-5977

Corporation Name: Dr. Dario Del Rizzo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 405
8333 Weston Road
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 8E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 264-5977
Fax: (905) 264-9686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 23 Nov 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 28 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 23 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. DARIO DEL RIZZO MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Del Rizzo (CPSO#: 50420 )
Business Address: 405-8333 Weston Road
Vaughan Ontario L4L 8E2
905-264-5977

Corporation Name: Dr. Dario Del Rizzo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARIO FRANCESCO DEL RIZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEL RIZZO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DARIO FRANCESCO DEL RIZZO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEL RIZZO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Feb 2023
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Feb 2023
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982