THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:55:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Toronto Institute
for Reproductive Medicine
Suite 300
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Toronto Ontario M8X 2W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 233-8111
Fax: (416) 233-8360

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alfonso Del Valle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Del Valle Rebeil (CPSO#: 50422 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Toronto Institute
for Reproductive Medicine
Suite 300
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Toronto Ontario M8X 2W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 233-8111
Fax: (416) 233-8360

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 04 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alfonso Del Valle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Del Valle Rebeil (CPSO#: 50422 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFONSO PABLO DEL VALLE REBEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEL VALLE REBEIL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALFONSO PABLO DEL VALLE REBEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEL VALLE REBEIL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Nacional Autónoma de México Facultad de Medicina, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 1986

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1981