THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:24:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 7N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Derksen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Derksen (CPSO#: 50426 )
Business Address: Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 7N7
(519) 938-8000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Orangeville Family Medical Centre
Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 7N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 938-8000
Fax: (519) 938-8080

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kenneth Derksen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Derksen (CPSO#: 50426 )
Business Address: Suite 100
1 Elizabeth Street
Orangeville Ontario L9W 7N7
(519) 938-8000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH JOHN DERKSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERKSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH JOHN DERKSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERKSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1985

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982