THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:46:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 510
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 273-4380
Fax: (905) 273-4335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruth A. Connelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Connelly (CPSO#: 50433 )
Business Address: Suite 510
89 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 273-4380

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 510
89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 273-4380
Fax: (905) 273-4335

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1984
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ruth A. Connelly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Connelly (CPSO#: 50433 )
Business Address: Suite 510
89 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 273-4380

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUTH ANNE CONNELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNELLY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUTH ANNE CONNELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNELLY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1984
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 1984

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982