THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:57:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 690A Queen St E
Toronto ON M4M 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 461 3419
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 127
701 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3H 2S7
Phone: 416-630-1333
Fax: 416-630-1323

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Doidge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Doidge (CPSO#: 50445 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 690A Queen St E
Toronto ON M4M 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 461 3419
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Suite 127
701 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M3H 2S7
Phone: 416-630-1333
Fax: 416-630-1323

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Doidge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Doidge (CPSO#: 50445 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK STEPHEN DOIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOIDGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK STEPHEN DOIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOIDGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Jul 2018
Summary:
Note: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed as from April 15, 2020.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Jul 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Jul 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Jul 2018
Summary:
Note: All of the elements of this SCERP have been completed as from April 15, 2020.
 
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Jul 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Jul 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1982