THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:03:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 57 Misty River Drive
Conestogo Ontario N0B 1N0
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (519) 664-3018
Fax: (519) 744-7363
Address: St Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 09 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ralph Grinberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Grinberg (CPSO#: 50484 )
Business Address: St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 57 Misty River Drive
Conestogo Ontario N0B 1N0
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (519) 664-3018
Fax: (519) 744-7363
Address: St Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 09 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ralph Grinberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Grinberg (CPSO#: 50484 )
Business Address: St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RALPH GRINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRINBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RALPH GRINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRINBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1978