THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:53:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Forces Health Services
CFB Kingston
PO Box 17000, Stn Forces
Kingston Ont
Kingston Ontario K7K 7B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 541 5010
Extension: 5776
Fax: (613) 541 4607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Elliott (CPSO#: 50501 )
Business Address: 33 CFHSvs
CFB Kingston
PO Box 17000
Kingston Ontario K7K 7B4
(613) 541-5010 Extn: 5776

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Canadian Forces Health Services
CFB Kingston
PO Box 17000, Stn Forces
Kingston Ont
Kingston Ontario K7K 7B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 541 5010
Extension: 5776
Fax: (613) 541 4607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 27 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah Elliott Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Elliott (CPSO#: 50501 )
Business Address: 33 CFHSvs
CFB Kingston
PO Box 17000
Kingston Ontario K7K 7B4
(613) 541-5010 Extn: 5776

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Dec 1984

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979