THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:28:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, ARMENIAN, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 Coxwell Ave
2nd floor/suite 208
East York ON M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-406-6540
Fax: 416-406-6541

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 06 Sep 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William El Masri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. El Masri (CPSO#: 50503 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, ARMENIAN, ITALIAN
Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 840 Coxwell Ave
2nd floor/suite 208
East York ON M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-406-6540
Fax: 416-406-6541

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 06 Sep 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 06 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. William El Masri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. W. El Masri (CPSO#: 50503 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM SAMUEL AZIZ EL MASRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL MASRI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM SAMUEL AZIZ EL MASRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL MASRI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicine, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1979